U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-70126
  • Case Name: Charles Jeffrey Edington and Carla Edington
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Motion to Borrow / Incur]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Submit]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Entered]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Borrow / Incur]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice (only) of Opportunity to Object/Respond to Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Additional/Amended Notice of Claim Filed]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Motion to Dismiss Case (Tr 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.