open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:14-cv-07554
    Party Name:Stanley Jordan v. City of Hawthorne et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Preclude]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?600350
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =