open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-02201
    Party Name:John Johnson v. City of Long Beach
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Document Sealed]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:March 27, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?613998
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =