open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00923
    Party Name:Arnold Evans v. City of Long Beach Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:April 22, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?582727
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =