open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:14-cv-01688
    Party Name:Leon Rosby v. City of Hawthorne et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Reopened]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?584614
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =