open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:10-cv-05742
    Party Name:Della Roshawn Richardson v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment (Partial)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - NON-FINAL]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appointment of Counsel]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassignment of Case (G-41)]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?479088
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =