open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:16-04058
    Party Name:Flotte v. County of San Joaquin
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Alias Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Discovery]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [none]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?546360
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =