open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-03493
    Party Name:City of Long Beach v. Monsanto Company et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (Non-Motion)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certify Class Action]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exceed Page Limitation]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order re Discovery Matter]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Discovery Matter]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel Answers to Interrogatories]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:May 29, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?648298
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =