Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04204
    Party Name:Michael Sahakian v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04204
    Party Name:Michael Sahakian v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04204
    Party Name:Michael Sahakian v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04204
    Party Name:Michael Sahakian v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04204
    Party Name:Michael Sahakian v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04204
    Party Name:Michael Sahakian v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?650414

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 1 =