open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04577
    Party Name:Rory Moroney v. City of Long Beach, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Evidence]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Preclude]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:May 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?651431
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =