Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-08569
    Party Name:Ya-May Christle v. City of Arcadiaet al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand Case to State Court]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Granting (CV 104A)]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?663196
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =