open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00981
    Party Name:John Doe v. City of Monrovia
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Staying Case]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?669703
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =