Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-03738
    Party Name:Keith Freeman et al v. City of West Covina et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?678568
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =