open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-04915
    Party Name:Kenneth Letourneau et al v. City of Carson et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?682996
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =