open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-06024
    Party Name:The Estate of Vicente Gonzales v. City of Huntington Park et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit to Motion]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?686477
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =