open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-07635
    Party Name:Sheliema Lewis v. City of Culver City et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?691778
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =