open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-00203
    Party Name:John Doe v. City of Hawaiian Gardens et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:April 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?698264
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =