open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-00800
    Party Name:Rosa May v. First Motor Group of Encino, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 01, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?700095
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =