open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-05129
    Party Name:Christian Garcia v. City of El Monte et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:July 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?713471
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =