open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-05221
    Party Name:Fernando Mosquera v. City of San Gabriel et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Adjudication]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?713777
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =