open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-bk-20178-ER
    Party Name:St. Francis Medical Center of Lynwood Foundation
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [List of Equity Security Holders]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration (motion)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1837813
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =