open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-08274
    Party Name:Acapulco Inn Holdings, LLC et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case (to Lift)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) (Interlocutory Appeal)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Reopened]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enlargement of Time to File]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enlargement of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?723901
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =