open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-09996
    Party Name:Hit and Miss, Enterprises, Inc. v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?730142
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =