open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00442
    Party Name:Phillip Killgore v. City of South El Monte et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?734378
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =