open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01267
    Party Name:Andreas Hernandez v. City of Culver City, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?737509
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =