open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01848
    Party Name:Sweetwater Malibu CA, LLC v. Mauricio Umansky et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Create Case Association]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?739768
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =