open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04134
    Party Name:Lloyd Joseph Collins et al v. City of Inglewood et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:November 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?746409
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =