open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04126
    Party Name:George Lopez Ramirez v. City of Glendale et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?746379
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =