open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04306
    Party Name:BASF Corporation v. Als Body Shop of Huntington Park, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?746937
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =