open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-06069
    Party Name:Patricia A. Krage v. City of Lakewood et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?752732
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =