open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-08391
    Party Name:Jackeline Alameida et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?760029
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =