open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01490
    Party Name:Garcia v. Suh et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:July 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:April 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?773166
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =