open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:20-cv-08356
    Party Name:Philip Eisen v. Blackbaud, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Change of Lead Counsel]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?794699
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =