open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:20-cv-08524
    Party Name:Nusaiba Mubarak v. City of Los Angeles et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Request]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency in Summons]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?795251
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =