U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-03329
  • Case Name: Okta, Inc. v. Biogy, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Relating Case]
  • May 02, 2025: [Opposition/Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerk's Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only]
  • April 28, 2025: [Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 28, 2025: [Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Patent/Trademark Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.