U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-03499
  • Case Name: Bahamonde et al v. Amazon.com Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 24, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate/Proof of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulation without Proposed Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Removal Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.