U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01950-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Helms
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Vacated Hearing(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 01, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 30, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [~ .Spanish]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.