U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00001
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Coleman Company, The
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 15, 2016: [Withdraw]
  • March 14, 2016: [Minute Order]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 13, 2016: [Memorandum]
  • January 08, 2016: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.