U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-01033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cabral et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Hearing]
  • June 06, 2016: [Exclude]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to Indict]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 13, 2016: [Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 04, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.