U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-rj-00007
  • Case Name: Cecil et al v. Rocky Mountain Railway and Mining Museum et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Protective Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • August 25, 2016: [Clarify]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • July 13, 2016: [Minute Order]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Writ of Entry]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Writ Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.