U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00123
  • Case Name: Mid America Solutions, LLC v. Merchant Solutions International, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Memorandum]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 09, 2016: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.