U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00151
  • Case Name: DCD Partners, LLC et al v. North America National Marketing, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 18, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2016
  • October 10, 2016: [Transfer Case]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • October 07, 2016: [Transfer Case]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2016: [Memorandum]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.