U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00191
  • Case Name: Motion for Protective Order et al v. USA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Protective Order]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Compel]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 22, 2016: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.