U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-rj-00014
  • Case Name: Kaminski v. Weins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 01, 2017: [Vacate]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 23, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • March 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Enforce Judgment]
  • February 01, 2017: [Consolidate Cases]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.