U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-rj-00009
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilliam
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 15, 2018: [Memorandum]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 13, 2018: [Leave to Restrict]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Show Cause]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.