U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00171
  • Case Name: First Choice Federal Credit Union et al v. Wendy's Company, The et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2017: [Minute Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.