U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-mj-07006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paup
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 14, 2019: [Leave to Restrict]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 26, 2018: [Reconsideration]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Leave to Restrict]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.