U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-rj-00009
  • Case Name: Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. v. Walkmed Infusion, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
July, 2019
  • July 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Joinder]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Vacate]
  • December 11, 2018: [Intervene]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Appoint Receiver]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Appoint Receiver]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.