U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-rj-00016
  • Case Name: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company v. Boswell-Olsen Enterprises, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Entry of Default]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • January 08, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
December, 2018
  • December 24, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.