open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02307
    Party Name:Brito v. HD Development of Maryland, Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?191122
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =